-
Posts
2533 -
Joined
-
Last visited
West Kay's Achievements
About Me
LS Taxi Cab Company > Lider: [GF]Vince > Sublider: [GF]GalaxxY > Dispacher (4)
01.10.2014 - Joined the faction
15.10.2014 - Got rank 2
29.10.2014 - Got rank 3
5.12.2014 - Got rank 4
31.12.2015 - Left the faction
Period: 92 zile
69 Pier Mobs > Lider: James[ToV] > Sublider: [uS]Timothy./Darius.xD[ToV] > Mummy(2)
03.01.2015 - Joined the faction
18.01.2015 - Got rank 2
06.02.2015 - Received FactionWarn
20.02.2015 - Left the faction
Period: 48 zile
Vietnamese Boys > Lider: KeNNedy > Sublider: [AIM]TiG3R
Lider: [AIM][RP]Motarel > Sublider: Katzuno[AUR] / [AIM]FaN007
Lider: [AIM]FaN007 > Sublideri: [uS]KinoTo / xKay.[VIP] & [AIM]TiG3R
Lider: [AIM]TiG3R > Sublideri: Sassori[VIP] & xKay.[VIP]
Lider: xKay.[ToV] > Sublideri: HeLpErR / MaNi.TheSaint & [AIM]TiG3R / Zoly.xD / [AIM]Nowerbach > President(Lider)
23.02.2015 - Joined the faction
11.03.2015 - Got rank 2
23.04.2015 - Got rank 3
04.06.2015 - Got rank 4
01.07.2015 - Got rank 6
20.07.2015 - Got rank 4
23.07.2015 - Got rank 6
23.09.2015 - Got leader
28.02.2016 - Received FactionWarn
30.03.2016 - Received a FW clear
21.05.2016 - Received FactionWarn
19.06.2016 - Resigned from leader
23.07.2016 - Received a Faction Warn
29.07.2016 - Left the faction
Period: 520 zile
Vietnamese Boys:
Green Street Bloods > Lider: [AIM]Sidorov > Sublideri: [AIM]Cokemeister & [AIM]Esquire / [AIM]Kenon > Money Launderer(3)
28.07.2016 - Joined the faction
11.08.2016 - Got rank 2
10.09.2016 - Got rank 3
17.09.2016 - Left the faction
Period: 51 zile
The Tsar Bratva > Lider: [rTn]Octavian.Tavy > Sublideri: Mihai..[ToV] & xKay.[ToV] > Sovietnik(6)
15.07.2017 - Joined the faction
15.07.2017 - Got rank 6
Period: xx zile
My Mods: Link
Last update on: 12.08.2017
© Kay RPG Vietnamese Boys Leader